IL SR0994 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April of 2018 as Prevent Child Abuse America Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
PREVENT CHILD ABUSE MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Be Adopted Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=994&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR0994.htm |