IL SR0986 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the President of the United States and the Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services to adopt policies to repeal the current discriminatory donor suitability policies regarding blood donations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHANGE BLOOD DONOR POLICIES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-09SenateSession Sine Die
2017-10-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-10-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-10-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-10-18SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback