IL SR0708 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 7, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 7, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the week of May 12 through May 18, 2024 as Home Fire Sprinkler Week in the State of Illinois.
Title
HOME FIRE SPRINKLER WEEK
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] |
Sen. Karina Villa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=708&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SR/10300SR0708.htm |