IL SR0699 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March 10-16, 2024 as "MS Awareness Week" in the State of Illinois and encourages all Illinoisans to learn more about multiple sclerosis and what they can do to support individuals with MS and their families. Recognizes the importance of finding the cause and cure of MS and expresses appreciation for the dedication that the National Multiple Sclerosis Society has shown toward creating a world free of MS.
Title
MS AWARENESS WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=699&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SR/10300SR0699.htm |