IL SR0492 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages schools to offer Breakfast After the Bell to students via alternative delivery methods, such as Breakfast in the Classroom, Grab n' Go, and Second Chance Breakfast.
Title
SUMMER FOOD SERVICE PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 25, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Be Adopted Agriculture; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=492&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR0492.htm |