IL SR0466 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the General Assembly to take action to modernize its early childhood education funding and teacher qualification standards to address the early childhood workforce crisis. Urges the Governor of Illinois to increase early childhood education provider representation on the Illinois Learning Council, the DCFS Daycare Advisory Council, the DHS Childcare Advisory Council, and the Professional Development Advisory Council to assure provider voices are heard as early childhood education policy is developed and implemented.
Title
EARLY CHILDHOOD ED CRISIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions November 13, 2019 |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Be Adopted Education; 009-000-000 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=466&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0466.htm |