IL SR0223 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses support for the critical research of the Chemistry of Life Processes Institute at Northwestern University and the important contributions to human health of leading biotechnology and pharmaceutical companies based in Illinois and across the nation.
Title
CHEMISTRY OF LIFE-SUPPORT
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=223&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0223.htm |