IL SR0223 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the President of the United States, the Attorney General of the United States, the Mayor of Chicago, the Chicago Police Superintendent, the Cook County Sheriff, and the Cook County State's Attorney to work together so that all firearms offenses that are eligible for federal prosecution be referred to the federal government for prosecution under existing federal law.
Title
CURB FIREARM VIOLENCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=223&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SR/09800SR0223.htm |