IL SR0220 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March 15, 2017 as Adult Down Syndrome Awareness Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
ADULT DOWN SYNDROME DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=220&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR0220.htm |