IL SR0220 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages furthering the effort to create a comprehensive pavement preservation and maintenance plan in Illinois. Commends the Illinois Department of Transportation for initiating Illinois' first pavement preservation program in 2004. Recommends that IDOT further develop a full-scale pavement preservation program.
Title
PAVEMENT PRESERVATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 25, 2011 |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 009-000-000 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=220&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SR/09700SR0220.htm |