IL SR0217 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares April 9, 2019 as Southern Illinois University Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SIU DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateResolution Adopted
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateBe Adopted Higher Education; 012-000-000
2019-03-19SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2019-03-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-13SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback