IL SR0131 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March 7, 2019 as "Vending Day" in the State of Illinois.
Title
VENDING DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 6, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=131&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0131.htm |