IL SR0105 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Illinois Department on Aging, the thirteen Area Agencies on Aging, and a State-wide membership organization that advocates for the needs of seniors, with the advice of the Illinois Council on Aging and the Older Adult Services Advisory Committee, and in collaboration with other departments and offices of State government, advocacy organizations on behalf of older adults, local units of government, and organizations in the private sector, to assess the preparedness of the State of Illinois and counties and communities within the thirteen Planning and Service Areas of Illinois for the aging of the population and shall submit a report with recommendations for the planning and development of livable communities for all ages in Illinois to the Illinois General Assembly, the Office of the Governor, and local officials by January 1, 2011.
Title
AGING ASSESSMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-29 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 23, 2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Be Adopted Human Services; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-16 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with Secretary |