IL SR0090 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requests that the Department of Children and Family Services and the Department of Public Health collaborate and devise policy recommendations regarding HIV supportive services and prevention.
Title
HIV SERVICES - DCFS & IDPH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 12, 2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Be Adopted Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Reported Back To Human Services; 005-000-000 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Issues Relating to Department of Children and Family Services |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=90&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SR/09900SR0090.htm |