IL SJRCA0038 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislative Article of the Illinois Constitution concerning the passage of revenue bills. Provides that any bill resulting in the increase of revenue to the State may become law only by a vote of three-fifths of the members in each house of the General Assembly. Provides that each house of the General Assembly shall have a revenue committee. Provides that there shall be 25 members on the revenue committee in the House of Representatives. Provides that there shall be 13 members on the revenue committee in the Senate. Provides that revenue committee members may be removed from the committee only by a majority, recorded, roll call vote of all members of the committee's respective chamber. Provides that revenue committees may not vote upon a bill until a public hearing has been held. Effective on approval by the electors.
Title
REVENUE-3/5 VOTE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-02-09 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=38&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SJRCA&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SJRCA/09700SC0038.htm |