IL SJR0067 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Great Migration Centennial Commission to work toward the commemoration and celebration of the Great Migration Centennial 1916-2016.
Title
GREAT MIGRATION CENTENNIAL COM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-28 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Adopted Both Houses | |
2010-03-17 | Resolution Adopted 114-001-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2010-02-24 | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-07-07 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-06-23 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-05-28 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-28 | Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000 | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions | |
2009-05-28 | Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-22 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-07 | Filed with Secretary |