IL SJR0041 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE SENATE OF THE ONE HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Friday, May 19, 2023, the Senate stands adjourned until the call of the President; and the House of Representatives stands adjourned until the the call of the Speaker.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2023-05-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2023-05-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford; 3-6(a) |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=41&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SJR/10300SJ0041.htm |