IL SJR0029 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates U.S. Route 51 starting at N2600 East Road in Assumption north to the Shelby–Macon County Line as the "Conner-Keegan Memorial Highway".
Title
CONNER-KEEGAN MEMORIAL HGWY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2024-05-03 | House | Resolution Adopted 094-000-000 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-03-05 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 015-000-000 |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-06-26 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-25 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-05-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2023-05-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 18, 2023 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |