IL SJR0021 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the Illinois State Board of Education, special education cooperatives, and each school district in this State to consider the potential benefits of inclusive education for children with and without disabilities in Illinois.
Title
CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-05-15 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Be Adopted Education; 015-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=21&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SJR/10100SJ0021.htm |