IL SJR0021 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses the opinion of the Illinois General Assembly regarding the need for the United States and the State of Illinois to address the problem of global climate change through the adoption of a fair and effective approach that safeguards American jobs, ensures affordable energy for citizens, and maintains America's global competitiveness.
Title
ADDRESS CLIMATE CHANGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-12 | Postponed - Environment | |
2009-03-05 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Environment | |
2009-02-20 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale E. Risinger | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=21&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SJR/09600SJ0021.htm |