IL SB3925 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
If and only if Senate Bill 1849 of the 97th General Assembly becomes law as amended by House Amendments No. 2 and 3: amends the Chicago Casino Development Authority Act with respect to removal of members from the Board of the Authority, powers of the Authority, casino management contracts, local regulation, and contracts with the Authority or casino operator license; amends the Election Code to prohibit political contributions from licensees or applicants under various gaming statutes and from casino managers; amends the State Finance Act to provide for a transfer of moneys to the Fund for the Advancement of Education from the State Gaming Fund; amends the Illinois Municipal Code to provide that any municipality in Lake County that utilizes the police, fire, ambulance, or other emergency services of another unit of local government in providing services to a riverboat or casino shall provide adequate compensation for such services; amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975 to require the Illinois Racing Board to submit a report to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2013 that examines the feasibility of conducting electronic gaming at a race track located in Rock Island County; and amends the Illinois Gambling Act to make changes in provisions concerning the Illinois Gaming Board application for and issuance of owners licenses, electronic gaming, and distribution of admission and wagering taxes. Effective immediately or on the effective date of Senate Bill 1849 of the 97th General Assembly, whichever is later.
Title
GAMING-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-12-05 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2013 |
2012-12-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2012-12-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-12-04 | House | First Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2012-12-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 031-017-001 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading December 4, 2012 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 29, 2012 |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-002-003 |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2012-11-21 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2012-11-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 8, 2013 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |