IL SB3913 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations to the Department of Human Services for fiscal year beginning July 1, 2012, as follows: Home Services Program $399,380,000; Centers for Independent Living $4,475,600; Community Reintegration Program $3,400,000; Payable from the Home Service Medicaid Trust Fund $240,000,000; Effective July 1, 2012.
Title
$DHS-HOME SERVICES PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Annazette R. Collins |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3913&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/PDF/09700SB3913.pdf |