IL SB3821 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes a technical change in the short title Section.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Belt [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] |
Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 1-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3821&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3821.htm |