IL SB3796 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Local Governmental and Governmental Employees Tort Immunity Act. Provides that upon the request of an employee, the local public entity shall provide for the indemnification of any judgment in or settlement of a claim or an action associated with the employee's employment, to the fullest extent permitted by law, and payment of legal defense costs from such claims and actions brought against the employee, in either an individual or official capacity, provided, however: (i) that the action taken by the employee was on behalf of the local public entity; (ii) that the litigation against the employee was not initiated by the local public entity or State or federal government and does not pertain to a criminal defense; or (iii) that the litigation was not initiated by the employee. Provides that the employee shall have the ability to retain legal representation of his or her own choosing and that the local public entity shall hold the employee harmless from the payment of any and all reasonable attorney's fees and costs associated with the defense in the litigation. Makes other changes. Deletes provisions permitting a local governmental entity to elect to do any one or more of the following: (i) appear and defend against the claim or action; (ii) indemnify the employee or former employee for his court costs or reasonable attorney's fees, or both, incurred in the defense of such claim or action; (iii) pay, or indemnify the employee or former employee for a judgment based on such claim or action; or (iv) pay, or indemnify the employee or former employee for, a compromise or settlement of such a claim or action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOC GOVT IMMUNITY-INDEMNITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08SenateSession Sine Die
2012-05-02SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2012-03-30SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 26, 2012
2012-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2012
2012-03-08SenateSecond Reading
2012-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2012
2012-03-07SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
2012-02-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2012-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2012-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2012-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
745102-302Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback