IL SB3796 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person who drives a vehicle upon any highway of this State at a speed that is 30 miles per hour or more but less than 40 miles per hour in excess of the applicable maximum speed limit established under the Illinois Vehicle Code or a local ordinance commits a Class B misdemeanor.
Title
VEH CD-EXCESSIVE SPEEDING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1002 | |
2010-07-02 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-07-02 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-23 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-23 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-003-000 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-22 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-21 | Do Pass / Short Debate Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2010-04-12 | Assigned to Vehicles & Safety Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-25 | First Reading | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-25 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2010-03-25 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons | |
2010-03-25 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2010-03-25 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico | |
2010-03-25 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cullerton-Wilhelmi | |
2010-03-25 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-03-25 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 005-000-000 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Added as Chief Co-Sponsor-Senator Wilhelmi | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2010-03-23 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2010-03-23 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-23 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2010-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Haine | |
2010-03-12 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000 | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 006-000-000 | |
2010-03-02 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |