IL SB3783 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Appropriations - Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Appropriations - Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Managed Care Organization Provider Assessment Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Changes the Tier 1 assessment amount for managed care organizations to $78.90 per member month (rather than $60.20 per member month). Changes the Tier 2 assessment amount for managed care organizations to $1.40 per member month (rather than $1.20 per member month). Provides that for State fiscal year 2020, and for each State fiscal year thereafter (rather than for State fiscal year 2020 through State fiscal year 2025), the Department of Healthcare and Family Services may adjust rates or tier parameters or both. Makes changes to the definition of "base year". Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
DHFS-MANAGED CARE ASSESSMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5H-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5H-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3783&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3783.htm |