IL SB3772 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Economic Development for a Growing Economy Tax Credit Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the amount of the credit.
Title
ECON DEVELOPMENT TAX CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-23 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2010 | |
2010-04-09 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2010-03-26 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link | |
2010-03-24 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-03-24 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2010-03-24 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2010-03-24 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2010-03-24 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2010-03-24 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine | |
2010-03-23 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2010-03-23 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-03-08 | Postponed - Revenue | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue | |
2010-03-05 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 19, 2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Revenue | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3772&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3772.htm |