IL SB3760 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Improving Access to State-operated Mental Health Facilities Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services, Division of Mental Health, shall provide education and training on an annual basis for all psychiatrists and clinical psychologists who provide care to forensic patients in State-operated mental health facilities utilizing nationally recognized best practices for determining when forensic patients are no longer, due to mental illness, reasonably expected to inflict serious physical harm upon themselves or others or when they may be safely restored to fitness to stand trial and subject to treatment on an outpatient basis under the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that the Division shall also provide training to psychiatrists and clinical psychologists concerning how to provide expert testimony in court hearings to determine whether forensic patients should be released. Provides that the Division shall provide education and training on an annual basis for all clinical social workers who provide care to forensic patients in State-operated mental health facilities concerning the types of community mental health services available in the community. Defines "forensic patient" as a person in an Illinois State-operated mental health facility who has been committed to the facility after having been found not guilty by reason of insanity or unfit to stand trial. Defines other terms. Effective immediately.
Title
IMPROV ACCESS ST MENTAL HLTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3760&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3760.htm |