IL SB3750 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that the State Board of Elections shall assist the local election authorities in implementing a system in order to issue voter registration identification cards with a photograph of the elector. Provides that a person desiring to vote shall present a valid and current photograph identification. Provides that a person who fails to present the required identification is entitled to cast a provisional ballot. Provides that the State Board of Elections shall establish an aggressive voter education program concerning the provisions in this Act. Effective July 1, 2012.
Title
ELECTIONS VOTER PHOTO ID
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Held in Executive; Subcommittee on Election Law |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on Election Law |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 17-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 18-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 18A-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 18A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 4-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 4-35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 5-21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 5-45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6-57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 6-85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3750&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3750.htm |