IL SB3749 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Appropriations - Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Appropriations - Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that beginning January 1, 2025, the Department of Children and Family Services shall reimburse Children's Community-Based Health Care Centers at the lower of the Children's Community-Based Health Care Center's usual and customary charge to the public or at the Department rate of $1650 (rather than $950). Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
DHFS-KIDS COMM HLTH CNTER-RATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-2.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3749&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3749.htm |