IL SB3739 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1419
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1419
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mortgage Foreclosure Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that specified procedures and counseling requirements that are described as providing homeowner protection in the foreclosure process are repealed 3 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act (instead of April 6, 2011). Effective immediately.
Title
FORECLOSE-HOMEOWNER PROTECTON
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-02 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1419 | |
2010-08-02 | Effective Date October 1, 2010 | |
2010-08-02 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 048-003-000 | |
2010-05-27 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2010-05-27 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2010-05-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 | |
2010-05-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-05-07 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-07 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-05-07 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley | |
2010-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 7, 2010 | |
2010-05-07 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-05-07 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-026-003 | |
2010-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-05-07 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-05-07 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 009-005-000 | |
2010-05-06 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee | |
2010-05-06 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-06 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joseph M. Lyons | |
2010-04-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 014-000-000 | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-16 | First Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons | |
2010-03-16 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 046-000-000 | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2010-03-11 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 008-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Financial Institutions | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |