IL SB3713 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Comptroller Act. Authorizes the State Comptroller to create, administer, manage, and operate a supplemental employee deferral plan to supplement and enhance the retirement income of employees of public school districts and community colleges. Sets forth the requirements for a supplemental employee deferral plan.
Title
EMPLOYEE DEFERRAL PLAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Carole Pankau |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions and Investments |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Suzi Schmidt |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzi Schmidt |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Carole Pankau |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3713&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3713.htm |