IL SB3683 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Broadband Deployment, Equity, Access, and Affordability Act of 2022. Provides that access to affordable, reliable, high-speed broadband service is essential to full participation in modern life in the State and throughout the United States. Defines terms. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall establish and implement a statewide broadband service grant program. Provides that the Department shall use money from the grant program only for the exclusive purpose of awarding grants to applicants for projects that are limited to the construction and deployment of broadband service into unserved areas in the State and for the Department's cost to administer the program. Provides that the Department shall not award grant money to a governmental entity or educational institution. Provides that the Department shall not, as a condition of an award of grant money, impose an open network architecture requirement, rate regulation, or other term or condition of service that differs from the applicant's terms or conditions of service in its other service areas. Includes provisions providing for the criteria for determining the award of funds, the information an applicant must provide for an application for a grant, the priority by which the Department shall follow in granting awards, and when the Department shall not award a grant to an applicant. Provides that when a grant is awarded, the Department shall provide notice on its website of each application receiving a grant. Provides that the Department shall require an applicant awarded a grant to submit a semi-annual report from the time the applicant receives the grant to 3 years after completion of the project. Makes a conforming change in the Freedom of Information Act. Effective immediately.
Title
BROADBAND ACCESS ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3683&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB3683.htm |