IL SB3663 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that except for specified purposes, no person may use a wireless telephone while operating a motor vehicle within 500 feet of an emergency scene where an authorized emergency vehicle is present and making use of audible or visual signals. Adds digital photographs and video to the definition of "electronic message" in provisions prohibiting the use of electronic communication devices while operating a motor vehicle.
Title
VEH CD-VIDEO-EMERGENCY SCENE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2012-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Haine |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2012 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-610.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 12-610.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |