IL SB3657 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends Public Act 98-27, Public Act 98-50, and Public Act 98-64. Adds supplemental appropriations to the Department of Human Services, the Department of Human Rights, the Department of Public Health, the Department of Corrections, the Department of Juvenile Justice, and the Department of Natural Resources for personal services and State contributions to Social Security. Also makes payments for the backlog of bills. Effective immediately.
Title
$SUPPLEMENTAL APPROPRIATIONS
Sponsors
Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. David Luechtefeld [R] | Sen. Kyle McCarter [R] |
Sen. Jason Barickman [R] | Sen. Darin LaHood [R] | Sen. Tim Bivins [R] | Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3657&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/PDF/09800SB3657.pdf |