IL SB3634 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2022, breast pumps, breast pump collection and storage supplies, and breast pump kits are exempt from the taxes imposed under those Acts. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-BREAST PUMPS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-03-14 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 011-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |