IL SB3633 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0847
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0847
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill, as amended by Senate Amendment No. 1, with the following changes: Provides that counties and municipalities must maintain documentation submitted from a contractor (rather than just maintain documentation) on the disposal of specified demolition debris, clean or general, or uncontaminated soil. Removes changes to the Environmental Protection Act.
Title
LOCAL-DEMOLITION DOCUMENTATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0847 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-002-000 |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 027-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2022-02-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Koehler |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 010-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 2.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-31-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |