IL SB3632 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates various amounts from the State Coronavirus Urgent Remediation Emergency Fund to the Department of Public Health for the administration of HIV/AIDS programs, including, but not limited to, the Getting to Zero-Illinois program. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
$IDPH-HIV/AIDS
Sponsors
Sen. Doris Turner [D] | Sen. Robert Peters [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
Sen. Celina Villanueva [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Appropriations- Health |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3632&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/PDF/10200SB3632.pdf |