IL SB3605 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $12,500,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority for grants to the Illinois YouthBuild Coalition. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DHS-YOUTHBUILD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-12SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback