IL SB3602 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates specified amounts to the Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois from the General Revenue Fund. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
$UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. James Clayborne [D] |
Sen. Jim Oberweis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3602&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/PDF/10000SB3602.pdf |