IL SB3601 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. In provisions concerning the Community Care Program, provides that within 30 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, rates for adult days services shall be increased to $15.02 per hour and rates for each way transportation services for adult day services shall be increased to $10.30. Effective immediately.
Title
AGING-ADULT DAY SERVICES RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3601&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3601.htm |