IL SB3599 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Insurance Committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room C-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Insurance Committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room C-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or a managed care plan that is amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or after January 1, 2025 shall provide coverage for medically necessary services provided by emergency medical services providers operating under a mobile integrated health care model. Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code to require coverage under those provisions.
Title
INS-MOBILE INTEGRATED HEALTH
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. Adriane Johnson [D] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] |
Rep. Jackie Haas [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 008-000-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 010-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.3f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 130 | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 165 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.71 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |