IL SB3576 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides a that person convicted of a forcible felony, a felony violation of the Humane Care for Animals Act, a felony violation of dog fighting, a felony violation of Deadly Weapons Article of the Code, a felony violation of Class 3 or higher of the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, a felony violation of Class 3 or higher of the Cannabis Control Act, or a felony violation of Class 2 or higher of the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act, shall not knowingly own, possess, have custody of, or reside in a residence with any dog weighing more than 20 pounds for a period of 10 years commencing upon the release of the person from incarceration.
Title
CRIM CD-VICIOUS DOGS-FELONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3576&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3576.htm |