IL SB3575 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Disposition of Remains of the Indigent Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall maintain lists (rather than a registry) of specified information. Provides that the Department shall update the lists with any new information within 5 business days (instead of 24 hours) of receiving the information. Provides that the listing of cadavers and all associated information maintained by the Department or other State facilities regarding a cadaver and its disposition are exempt from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that the Department shall establish by rule appropriate processes for family members of the deceased to access information in the listing. Provides that the Department may provide summary reports of aggregated data as determined by the Department, and that the summary reports are not exempt from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that the Department may (instead of shall) designate the next institution to receive a cadaver when requested from (instead of by) a State facility. Provides that if the number of cadavers is insufficient for the use of the relevant institutions, the Department may (instead of shall) determine which institution shall receive them. Deletes language requiring the Department to take into account the relative proportion of the numbers of students at each institution. Makes a corresponding change in the Freedom of Information Act. Effective June 1, 2018.
Title
INDIGENT REMAINS-IDPH REGISTRY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 66 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3575&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3575.htm |