IL SB3575 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Clinical Psychologist Licensing Act, Clinical Social Work and Social Work Practice Act, Marriage and Family Therapy Licensing Act, and Professional Counselor and Clinical Professional Counselor Licensing and Practice Act. In each Act, defines "sexual orientation change efforts" and provides that a professional licensed under the Act shall not engage in sexual orientation change efforts with a patient younger than 18 years of age. Further provides in each Act that any sexual orientation change efforts attempted on a patient younger than 18 years of age shall be grounds for discipline under the Act.
Title
SEX ORIENTATION CHANGE EFFORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 107 | 79 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 15 | 14.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 20 | 18.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 55 | 84 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3575&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3575.htm |