IL SB3553 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State University Certificates of Participation Act. Provides that the board of trustees of a State university has the power to enter into financing agreements in connection with the financing or refinancing (instead of just the financing) of capital improvements by selling certificates of participation in the installment payments made under such financing agreements; makes a related change. Provides that a State university must present to the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability information on the amount being financed or refinanced (instead of just financed), the nature of the project being financed or refinanced (instead of just financed), and the status of all currently outstanding (instead of currently issued) certificates of participation. Sets forth the maximum annual debt service amount for a State university's total outstanding (instead of total) certificate of participation obligation. Provides that the Act applies until December 31, 2024 (instead of December 31, 2014); makes a related change. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-PARTICIPATION CERT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2014-04-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 012-000-000 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 73 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 73 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 73 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 73 | 90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |