IL SB3547 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that driving on a suspended license during a period of summary suspension imposed due to failing or refusing to submit to chemical testing for the purpose of determining if a person is driving under the influence shall be a Class 4 felony regardless of whether or not the driver is eligible for a Monitoring Device Driving Permit.
Title
VEH CD-DRIVING ON SUSP LICENSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-16 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2014-04-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |