IL SB3540 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to establish a pilot program in which public high school students who are credit deficient or in need of a non-traditional education are provided an online alternative to earning a high school diploma while still enrolled in their public high school. Provides that the pilot program shall allow eligible high school students to take online courses provided by an online career education program and taught by teachers certified by the online career education program while those students are attending their public high school, which shall allow a student to earn enough credits to graduate from his or her high school or to receive a high school diploma and career certificate from the online career education program. Requires the State Board to choose 5 public high schools to participate in the pilot program and develop a plan for online career education programs participating in the pilot program. Sets forth classifications of career educational programming that the plan must address, and requires the plan to evaluate whether a student's education can be better addressed through an Internet-based delivery of education that meets certain requirements. Provides for a report to the General Assembly and rulemaking. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-ONLINE ALTERNATIVE PROG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |