IL SB3538 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires a school report card to include the most current data collected and maintained by the State Board of Education on the percentage of students, by grade level, who have an individualized education program or a federal Section 504 plan and who are chronically absent. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
SCH CD-REPORT CARD-ABSENCES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-17a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3538&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3538.htm |