IL SB3535 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that for community-integrated living arrangements licensed under the Act, the Office of the State Fire Marshal shall provide the necessary fire inspection to comply with licensing requirements. Provides that the Office of the State Fire Marshal may enter into an agreement with another State agency to conduct this inspection if qualified personnel are employed by that agency. Removes language providing that code enforcement inspection of the facility by the local authority may occur if the local authority having jurisdiction enforces code requirements that are equal to those enforced by the State Fire Marshal. Provides that nothing in provisions concerning fire inspections shall limit a local authority with jurisdiction from conducting local code inspection and enforcement or (rather than shall prohibit a local fire authority) from conducting fire incident planning activities. Effective immediately.
Title
COMMUNITY-INTEGRATED LIVING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 135 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |